Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bettino, Diane Amy, Conway, Erin Mccall, Katz, Jordan S, Uhlich, Ingrid Olga, Zavatsky, Deepa Janakiraman, (total of 5) See All against Darryle Swindell Aka Daryle Swindell Aka Darryle Swindell, Jr. Aka Daryle Swindell, Jr, Jane Doe, John Doe, Nyc Parking Violations Bureau, Nyc Transit Adjudication Bureau, (total of 6) See All represented by Petroff, Serge Felix, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Residential Foreclosure Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeResidential Foreclosure Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time138 days |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #001)
Date: December 29, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 10, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 07, 2015ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 31, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 25, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 31, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 07, 2016REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 12, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 26, 2016NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: July 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #001) | |
November 04, 2016 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #001) Decided: 11/04/2016ORDER ATTACHED Before Justice: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT Answer demanded: No Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
November 04, 2016 | Hearing |
ORDER ATTACHED (Motion #001) RES FORECLOSURE PART MOTIONS Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
October 07, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
November 10, 2015 | Hearing |
FSC - NOT SETTLED (R) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 230PM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
November 10, 2015 | Hearing |
DISPOSED - PROCEED BY MOTION RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PART Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.