Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Black, Nicole M, Friedman Vartolo Llp, Nardolillo, Michael William, Thibaut, Juliana, Vartolo, Ralph Lawrence, (total of 5) See All against Bonnie Tadrous, Citi Bank Asset Acceptance, Nyc Environmental Control Board, Rab Performance Recoveries, Saad Labib Tadrous, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with DESMOND A. GREEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDESMOND A. GREEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2011 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time126 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
January 10, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
January 09, 2023 | ASSIGNMENT OF BID | ||
November 01, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing - Notice of Sale | ||
November 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
October 17, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing - NOE | ||
October 17, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order appointing a successor referee |
||
October 05, 2022 |
ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE Substitution |
||
March 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale |
||
March 24, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.