Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mtglq Investors, L.P., U.S. Bank Trust National Association, As Trustee Pf Dwelling Series Iv Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. As Successor By Merger To Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Buonincontri, Andrew M, Friedman Vartolo Llp, Friedman Vartolo, Llp, Gershovich, Annette, Nardolillo, Michael William, (total of 7) See All against Frank A. Guido, Joseph Guido, Melissa Guido, Nancy Wiley, New York City Criminal Court, (total of 8) See All represented by File, Howard M, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Residential Foreclosure Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeResidential Foreclosure Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2012 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: November 20, 2012COUNTY CLERK MINUTES - PRIOR TO CONVERSION (SUBSEQUENT)
Date: November 20, 2012COUNTY CLERK CERTIFICATION OF MINUTES
Date: November 20, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
||
May 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
April 24, 2023 | Affidavit of Mailing, Notice of Entry | ||
April 24, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order Extending Sale Deadline and Other Relief |
||
April 14, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM | ||
March 09, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE E-mail sent to possible contacts for Nancy Willey per Skip Trace. |
||
March 03, 2023 | Affidavit of Publication | ||
February 28, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 28, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Motion to Extend Sale Deadline and Defendant's Motion for an Order to Show Cause - Re-Notice Letter Motion to Extend Sale Deadline and Defendant's Motion for an Order to Show Cause - Re-Notice Letter ... show more |
||
February 28, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.