Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carlos M Serrano Jr, Miguel A Serrano, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Feygin, Aleksey, against Efren Gatchalian, The City Of New York, The City Of New York Department Of Transportation, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas P. Aliotta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas P. Aliotta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2014 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Hearing |
CITY PART 2 CHRE Judge: C2 - THOMAS ALIOTTA |
|
December 03, 2020 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD CITY PART 2 CC Judge: C2 - THOMAS ALIOTTA |
|
September 03, 2020 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD CITY PART 2 CC Judge: C2 - THOMAS ALIOTTA |
|
June 22, 2020 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD CITY PART 2 Judge: C2 - THOMAS ALIOTTA |
|
June 18, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CITY PART 2 Judge: C2 - THOMAS ALIOTTA |
|
June 16, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED CITY PART 2 CC Judge: C2 - THOMAS ALIOTTA |
|
May 05, 2020 | Hearing |
CONFERENCE HELD CITY PART 2 CC Judge: C2 - THOMAS ALIOTTA |
|
February 25, 2020 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD CITY PART 2 CC Judge: C2 - THOMAS ALIOTTA |
|
December 17, 2019 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD CITY PART 2 CC Judge: C2 - THOMAS ALIOTTA |
|
October 22, 2019 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD CITY PART 2 CC Judge: C2 - THOMAS ALIOTTA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.