Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 2007-Br1, Securitized Asset Backed Receivables Llc Trust 2007-Br1, Trustee Under Pooling And Servicing Agreement, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., against Board Of Managers Of The Sunrise Tower Condiminium, Debra Dennis, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc, New Century Mortgage Corporation, Tony Clanton, (total of 5) See All represented by Baldwin, Sarah Beth, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Charles M Troia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles M Troia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
APPROVED - LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT TO E-FILING
Date: March 05, 2019ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: July 02, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 05, 2019NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: March 05, 2019NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: March 05, 2019ORDER - VACATE
Date: July 02, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 05, 2019MEMORANDUM
Date: July 02, 2021MEMORANDUM
Date: July 02, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 02, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 02, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 05, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 07, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 07, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 10, 2021STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 10, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #007)
Date: July 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #007) IAS Part 1 Motions Judge: Troia, Hon. Charles M. |
|
August 10, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
August 10, 2021 |
STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY Stipulation Canceling Notice of Pendency |
||
July 15, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 15, 2021 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #007) Notice of Entry with signed OSC annexed |
||
July 13, 2021 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #007) Signed Order to Show Cause |
||
July 07, 2021 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 07, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #007) Baldwin Aff'm ISO Proposed OSC |
||
July 07, 2021 | Motion |
Cancel/Extend Lis Pendens (Motion #007) Decided: 08/13/2021Withdrawn Before Justice: Troia, Hon. Charles M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Troia, Hon. Charles M. |
|
July 07, 2021 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.