Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Michael P Pappas, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Michael Guglielmo, Sophie Guglielmo, Steve Pappas, represented by Cammarata, Joseph Michael, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Ralph Porzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph Porzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (General Civil) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 11, 2022ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: December 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001) opposition to motion submitted by pro-se during hearing |
||
December 15, 2021 |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Order with Notice of Entry with Affirmation of Service |
||
December 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 14, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 22, 2021 | BRIEFING SCHEDULE | ||
November 19, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (COPY) |
||
October 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service for Notice of Motion |
||
October 27, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service for RJI |
||
October 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
October 26, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Helen Pappas Death Certificate Helen Pappas Death Certificate Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.