Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sefcu, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Donovan, Linda L, against Daniel Scott Van Wie, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: May 16, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: November 19, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: May 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
May 16, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 19, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
November 04, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service |
||
September 16, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 16, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.