Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lg 94 Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Croglio, Christina Marie, Keller, Amy Christine, against Rensselaer County, Rensselaer County Department Of Social Services, represented by Hacker, James E., in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with L. Michael Mackey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeL. Michael Mackey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 07, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: August 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 12, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1) Plaintiff Affidavit (Redacted) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 07, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #3)
Date: January 11, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #3) 1-11-2023 NOTICE OF ENTRY (Ren Co) |
||
January 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) 1-11-2023 AOS_REN_(NOTICE OF ENTRY) |
||
January 10, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) EXHIBIT B |
||
November 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) EXHIBIT A |
||
November 07, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) EXHIBIT C |
||
November 07, 2022 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #3) 11-7-2022 Memo of Law in Support |
||
November 07, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #3) 11-07-2022 JEH Affidavit in Support |
||
November 07, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) 11-07-2022 Notice of Motion to Consolidate (9243.006) |
||
November 07, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #3) 11-7-2022 AOS Motion to Consolidate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.