Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property Described In The Complaint, Mary Marcus, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, represented by Spina, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Laura M. Jordan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLaura M. Jordan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Order Directing Service Pursuant to CPLR 316 |
||
February 07, 2023 | SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI) | ||
February 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED) | ||
October 27, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) D- Vesting Deed and Death Certificate |
||
October 27, 2022 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1) Redaction Cover Page |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) F- Notice of Appearance |
||
October 27, 2022 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) Order Directing Service Pursuant to CPLR 316 |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) A- Summons, Complaint, Notice of Pendency and Certificate of Merit not Required |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) E- Affidavits of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.