Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Target #1796, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Clyne, Kevin M, against The Board Of Assessors And Or The Assessor Of The Town Of East Greenbush And The Board Of Assessment Review, represented by Almy, Stephen Mark, Casertino, Devon Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Richard J Mcnally presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J Mcnally Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 12, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 12, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
September 30, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 30, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 11, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
February 28, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY NOI 2021 |
||
February 28, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS-NOI 2021 |
||
December 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF INCOME AND EXPENSES | ||
September 01, 2021 |
ANSWER Intervenor-Respondent's Answer |
||
August 25, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 25, 2021 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.