Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jeffrey B. Wait D B A Wait'S Garage, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hickey, Peter James, against Erie Insurance Company Of New York, represented by Dominelli, Jennifer Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Richard J Mcnally presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J Mcnally Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaint
Date: June 08, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 30, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 07, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 30, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 19, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 09, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 20, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: November 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 22, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: July 18, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request adjournment of 3/22/23 status conference. |
||
January 09, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 18, 2022 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue with Jury Demand |
||
March 22, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
November 29, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
October 20, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 19, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Judge with Proposed PCSO |
||
September 09, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 07, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 30, 2021 | Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.