Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Langlois, Christopher P, against David Vandenburgh, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: September 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
September 14, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT EXECUTION PARTIALLY SATISFIED |
||
September 17, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 17, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 17, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION | ||
June 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 24, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.