Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carrington Mortgage Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Roth, Gerald C, against Melissa Knebel Aka Melissa S Knebel, Theodore Hs Knebel Aka Theodore Hs Knebel, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Richard J Mcnally presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J Mcnally Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 23, 2019COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: September 23, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 23, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
April 04, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
March 09, 2023 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE (Motion #3) AMENDED JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE |
||
January 11, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
October 13, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
August 16, 2022 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
June 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #3) ORDER OF REFERENCE WITH NOTICE OF ENTRY |
||
June 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S (Motion #3) VACANCY REGISTRATION |
||
June 24, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.