Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Heaney, Alexandra Rose, Rooney, Anthony J., against Jennifer Gendron Estate Of, Jennifer Gendron Estate Of, Kevin Gendron, Linda Gendron, Paul Gendron, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Richard J Mcnally presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J Mcnally Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 02, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 16, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #4) In the dropped Defendants place and pursuant to the Surrogates action |
||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #4) Notice of Pendency |
||
October 17, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #4) copy of the Notice of Return and Rejection |
||
October 17, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #4) copy of this Assignment |
||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #4) opies of the proposed amended pleadings |
||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #4) Copy of the Summons, Complaint and Notice of Pendency |
||
October 17, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
October 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #4) motion was denied by the Court via So Ordered Letter dated June 12, 2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.