Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb Trustee Of Stanwich Mortgage Loan Trust A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Greene, Jeffrey S, against John Herkert Jr, Polsinello Fuels Inc, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Richard J Mcnally presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J Mcnally Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 06, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 06, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 21, 2019CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 12, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 22, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 26, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 08, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 19, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 08, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 21, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 21, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 27, 2019RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: June 06, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 06, 2019NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 06, 2019CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: June 06, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 06, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 18, 2019COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: June 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
October 08, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER APPLICATION TO CONVERT PENDING ACTION TO E-FILING |
||
November 22, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT RECEIPT FOR NOTICE OF MOTION |
||
November 19, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT MILITARY SERVICE AFFIDAVIT |
||
September 27, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT STIPULATION & ORDER |
||
August 21, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL INTERVENTION |
||
August 21, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
||
July 08, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT DEFENDANT JOHN HERKERT, JR., ANSWER BY HIS ATTORNEY |
||
June 26, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
||
June 21, 2019 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (6) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.