Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank Na Trustee Of Nrz Pass Through Trust Vi, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brennan, Jennifer R., Kelly, Jacqueline Marie, Rugino, Edward, against Absolute Auto Credit Inc, Hudson Valley Dental Care Pc, Mary F Warner Aka Mary Warner, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Norman A Warner Jr Aka Norman A Warner Aka Norman Warner, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Richard J Mcnally presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J Mcnally Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 08, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 10, 2018CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: August 08, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 24, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 19, 2022 |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Re-file Notice of Pendency |
||
January 04, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY FOR ORDER FOR REFERENCE AND DEFAULT JUDGEMENT | ||
September 02, 2021 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
September 02, 2021 | ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE | ||
September 01, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
August 23, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION *Corrected* Notice of Conversion to eFiling with Affidavit of Service |
||
August 18, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETER APPLICATION TO CONVERT PENDING ACTION TO E-FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.