Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc Dba Mr Cooper, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against Barbara J Johnson, Stephanie V Johnson, represented by Breault, Adam Michael, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Richard J Mcnally presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J Mcnally Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 12, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 31, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: December 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
March 31, 2023 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
January 10, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
December 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
November 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - S S- Notice of Appearance |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F F- 90 day Notice F- 90 day Notice Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O O- Referee's Oath and Report of Amount Due |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - R R- N/A |
||
October 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E E- Notice of Default |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.