Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lsf11 Master Participation Trust, Us Bank Na Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Amanda Miner, Forrest H Rivers, Forrest Rivers Aka, in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Richard J Mcnally presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J Mcnally Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 19, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 13, 2022CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: April 19, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 19, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 19, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 01, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 04, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: June 01, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 19, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 11, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 02, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 16, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 12, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 04, 2018NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE
Date: February 15, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 13, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 17, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 08, 2020COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 19, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: August 23, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 15, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: May 31, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2019CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: April 19, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 25, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 08, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 08, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 21, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 08, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 08, 2020NOTICE OF MORTGAGE SERVICER CHANGE
Date: March 19, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 13, 2020NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 13, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 10, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: March 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 08, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 08, 2020FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: May 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2022REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: May 06, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: February 09, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: March 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 18, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: April 19, 2018OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2019OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 08, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 11, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
May 06, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
March 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE for Notice of Sale |
||
March 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
February 18, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Status Letter response |
||
February 09, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED | ||
January 13, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request for COVID Conference |
||
January 13, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS By Mail for COVID Conference Request |
||
January 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Notice of Conversion to Electronic Filing with Affidavit of Service by Mail |
||
January 10, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LTR TO CONVERT TO EFILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.