Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County. This case was filed in Rensselaer County Superior Courts with Young, Hon. Debra J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYoung, Hon. Debra J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
CategoryMat-Contested |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time273 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Young (Motion Part) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
September 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Young (Court Activity) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
September 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Young (Motion Part) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
August 16, 2017 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 09/07/2017Decided Before Justice: Young, Hon. Debra J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
August 16, 2017 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Young (Motion Part) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
July 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Young (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
July 05, 2017 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Young (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
May 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Pre Trial Conference Young (Pre-Trial Conference) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
May 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Young (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
May 12, 2017 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Young (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.