Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Sp-Other case in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Young, Hon. Debra J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYoung, Hon. Debra J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2016 |
CategorySp-Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time43 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Pre-Other Young (Court Activity) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
January 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Young (Motion Part) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
January 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Young (Hearing) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
January 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Young (Motion Part) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
January 08, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 01/27/2016Decided Before Justice: Young, Hon. Debra J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
January 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Young (Motion Part) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
December 16, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Young (Motion Part) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
December 15, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 12/16/2015Decided Before Justice: Young, Hon. Debra J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
|
December 15, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Young (Motion Part) Judge: Young, Hon. Debra J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.