Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElliott, Hon. Raymond J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 21, 2016 |
CategoryMat-Uncontested |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time227 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Elliott III (Motion Part) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
June 21, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 06/27/2016Decided Before Justice: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
June 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Elliott III (Motion Part) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
December 07, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided Elliott III (Court Activity) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
December 07, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Elliott III (Motion Part) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
November 27, 2015 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Elliott III (Motion Part) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
November 13, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 12/07/2015Decided Before Justice: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
November 13, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Elliott III (Motion Part) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.