Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelkonian, Hon. Michael H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2016 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2016 | Hearing |
Discontinued Melkonian (Court Activity) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
July 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled - Loan Modification Melkonian (Settlement Conference) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
June 27, 2016 | Hearing |
Continued Melkonian (Settlement Conference) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
March 28, 2016 | Hearing |
Continued Melkonian (Settlement Conference) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
|
January 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Continued Melkonian (Settlement Conference) Judge: Melkonian, Hon. Michael H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.