Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeElliott, Hon. Raymond J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management2 days |
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2016 |
CategoryTort-Other Negligence |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
|
Case Cycle Time233 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided Elliott III (Court Activity) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
July 07, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Elliott III (Motion Part) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
February 18, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Elliott III (Hearing) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
February 18, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Elliott III (Motion Part) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
December 15, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Elliott III (Motion Part) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
November 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Preliminary Conference Elliott III (Prelim. Conference) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
November 17, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Elliott III (Motion Part) Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
|
November 17, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 07/07/2016Decided Before Justice: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Elliott, Hon. Raymond J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.