Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of American Transit Insurance Company, As Subrogee Of Omer Mirdha And Maria Gregorio, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Sabella, Vince Anthony, against Akron Taxi Corp., in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Lourdes Ventura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLourdes Ventura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 12, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2021 |
JUDGMENT Money Judgment |
||
October 06, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - (PROPOSED) SUBMIT JUDGMENT PER JUDGES DECISION Judgment, Attorneys Affirmation, Bill of Costs and Affidavit of Mailing |
||
September 22, 2021 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
April 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Copy of the Petition dated November 12, 2020 |
||
April 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) A copy of the Order Dated March 19, 2021 |
||
April 08, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation in Support |
||
April 08, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Notice of Motion to Renew |
||
April 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) A copy of the correct Affidavit of Service related to this matter |
||
April 08, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service |
||
March 19, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.