Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Simply Funding, Llc,, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Murray, Christopher Ryan, against Moore Solutions Inc., Dba Moore Solutions, Terrance Moore, represented by Usher, Mikhail, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Robert Ian Caloras presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert Ian Caloras Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: October 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #001) Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Cross-Motion |
||
January 18, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Verification |
||
January 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) In opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply in further support of Motion to Dismiss |
||
January 18, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) NY Supreme Court Decisions |
||
January 18, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #001) In opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply in further support of Motion to Dismiss |
||
January 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 18, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
December 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #001) Sanctions Safe-Harbor Letter |
||
December 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #001) Kalamata v. Alegria |
||
December 30, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #001) Fox v. Pursuit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.