Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
David Diaz, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Grigoropoulos, Chrissy, against Kara L. Howley, Kevin Howley, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 13, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 16, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 16, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
December 09, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 16, 2021 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
||
November 16, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 16, 2021 | ANSWER WITH BP AND COMBINED DEMANDS | ||
November 16, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A medicare exhibit |
||
October 13, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 13, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 07, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.