Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ibrahima Sissoko, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stratan, Ihor, Viener, Joseph B, against Anthony Denardo, Laurie Landry, represented by Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Trial Scheduling Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrial Scheduling Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 16, 2022CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 16, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 16, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 16, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Disclosure per CPLR 3101(d) Dr. Diwan
Date: September 30, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 16, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 16, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 17, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: April 12, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 12, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 10, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 11, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 18, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 17, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 17, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 18, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 28, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 28, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 27, 2023STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: December 05, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: January 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: November 16, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 27, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 16, 2023CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 01, 2023ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: May 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 27, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) stip of discontinuance |
||
May 01, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
February 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) REPLY AFFIRMATION |
||
February 01, 2023 |
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) (Motion #002) Certification in Compliance |
||
February 01, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) ATTY CERTIFICATION |
||
January 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Affirmed Narrative Report of Dr. Diwan |
||
January 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Affidavit of Merit |
||
January 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Copy of an Email from Rehabilitation Medicine Center |
||
January 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Operative Report of Dr. Simela |
||
January 27, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Dr. Affirmation of Dr. Osafradu Opam |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.