Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sasha Nicole Thomas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Riccobono, Rocco R., Shulman, Dmitriy, against Rasier-Ny, Llc, Uber Technologies, Inc., Uber Usa, Llc, represented by Carr, Timothy Sean, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
August 22, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 28, 2022 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS second supplemental |
||
June 09, 2022 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
May 10, 2022 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
January 27, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion to Consolidate |
||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A - Singh v. Ahmed S&C |
||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B - Thomas v. Singh S&C |
||
January 27, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion to Consolidate |
||
January 27, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Exhibit D - Singh v. Uber S&C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.