Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jelena Pauvonic, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rose, Michael A, against Hackensack Services Corporation, Ilir Ukperaj, represented by Dahlgren, Eric Gordon, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 08, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
June 08, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 17, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 17, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
October 08, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
October 08, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 07, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 29, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.