Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Miasia Oakley, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Grossman, Jack, Pomara, Francesco, against Carolyn D Berry, Glenn K Weeks, Paul Andrew Page Sr, Paul A Page Jr, Rasier-Ny, Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Korcz, Amy Beth, Patterson, Jerome David, Perry, Jamal Akeem, Rosenberg, Peter David, Stern, Joshua Steven, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 25, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 10, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: POST EBT DEMAND FOR AUTHORIZATIONS |
||
February 02, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
January 30, 2023 |
STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Zahid Zafar and Rasier-Ny, Llc |
||
October 04, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Witness Disclosure |
||
August 01, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands |
||
July 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 27, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service for Notice of Appearance |
||
July 15, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO COMBINED DEMANDS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.