Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Stefanos Gogas, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Barbera, Steven, against Kenneth J. Ragusa, represented by Scahill, Francis J, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Lourdes M. Ventura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLourdes M. Ventura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ANSWER
Date: November 03, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 16, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PART
Judge: LOURDES M. VENTURA |
|
December 16, 2020 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
December 16, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
December 16, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A-C (Motion #001) Notice to Admit, Summons and Complaint, Answer, and Court Order |
||
December 04, 2020 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 04, 2020 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 03, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
October 21, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 07, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.