Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alejandra Rodriguez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Avshalumov, Roman Mikhail, against Jason Rodriguez-Batista, Michael Esposito, represented by Mahoney, Rachel Morgen, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Lourdes Ventura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLourdes Ventura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 07, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 02, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #002)
Date: September 09, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #003) PT 37 MOTIONS CALENDAR Judge: LOURDES M. VENTURA |
|
November 09, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED - NO OPP (Motion #002) PT 37 MOTIONS CALENDAR Judge: LOURDES M. VENTURA |
|
November 05, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
November 05, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #002) Correspondence dated 10/22/2020 |
||
November 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #002) IME No Show Letter |
||
November 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) IME Scheduling Letter |
||
November 05, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #003) Correspondence dated 10/22/2020 |
||
November 05, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #003) IME No Show Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.