Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Luis Siguencia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Deliso, Anthony Michael, against Lifecare Ambulette Inc., Parlo Zagrebenyuk, represented by Isserlis, Nancy L, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Lourdes Ventura presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLourdes Ventura Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 12, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 30, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #002) PT 37 MOTIONS CALENDAR MOVANT Judge: LOURDES M. VENTURA |
|
November 12, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
November 12, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 12, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Response to Post-EBT Demands |
||
September 30, 2020 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
September 30, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
September 30, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 30, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) E-mail to Plaintiff's counsel dated Sept 28, 2020 |
||
September 30, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Note of Issue, Certificate of Readiness and Affirmation |
||
September 30, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Post EBT Demand for Discovery and Inspection dated April 27, 2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.