Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rothschild Niyazov, Yakov Jack Shimonov, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Babaev, Eli, Bernard, Diane D, Shulman, Dmitriy, against 21St Century Snacks, Dylan Patrick Rupp, In-Store Distributors, Inc., represented by Cascone, Leonard Michael, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
October 24, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #005) S&C Index# 719690/2021 |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #005) elaw printout |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #005) D's Answer - Index# 719690/2021 |
||
August 08, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #005) email from nycourts |
||
August 08, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #005) Notice of Motion to Reargue |
||
August 08, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #005) Aff in Support of Mtn to Reargue |
||
July 19, 2022 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
May 20, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.