Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Kamola Kasimova, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Podolsky, Steven Vyacheslav, against Beth Welt, represented by Mccormack, John M., in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
December 10, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 11, 2021 |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE rji-pc request |
||
August 04, 2021 |
ANSWER With Demands |
||
August 04, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 13, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 01, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.