Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Belgium New York Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Maidenbaum, Jeffrey A, against Soliko Sapir A K A Soliku Sapir As Guarantor, Soliko Sapir A K A Soliku Sapir As Guarantor, Soly'S Jewelry Inc., in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 10, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: November 12, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
November 10, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Submitted with Attorney Affirmation |
||
November 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION additional mailing on the 2nd def, |
||
November 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION non military |
||
November 10, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION additional mailing on the corp. |
||
November 10, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT of facts |
||
August 02, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE on the 2nd def. |
||
July 19, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 01, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.