Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Clyde Cintron, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Subin, Herbert S, against 21-39 27Th St., Lp, represented by Yavana, Sylvester Samawa, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 01, 2021SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: September 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's CPLR 4532-b Notice of Intention |
||
December 20, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
September 16, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 30, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 30, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
December 07, 2021 |
NOTICE TO ADMIT Reply to Notice to Admit |
||
November 01, 2021 | Demand for Bill of Particulars with Combined Demands | ||
November 01, 2021 |
ANSWER Additional Miscellaneous Demands |
||
November 01, 2021 | Answer to Amended Complaint with Cross-Complaint | ||
October 12, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.