Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon, Successor To The Bank Of New York, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee On Behalf Of The Holders Of The Cit Mortgage Loan Trust, 2007-1 Assetbacked Certificates, Series 2007-1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fourtner, Tracy Mckay, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Heaney, Alexandra Rose, Mannuzza, Gabrielle Beth, Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie, (total of 9) See All against Capital One Bank, Criminal Court Of The City Of New York, Dexter Wharton As Heir To The Estate Of Charles Wharton, Dexter Wharton As Heir To The Estate Of Charles Wharton, Joenel Wharton As Heir To The Estate Of Charles Wharton, (total of 15) See All represented by Bronstein, Joshua Reid, Tordesillas, Bernard James, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Maurice E. Muir presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaurice E. Muir Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2023 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney - Incoming |
||
May 10, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 13, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Doctors letter |
||
April 12, 2023 |
NOTICE OF REJECTION (Motion #001) Notice of Rejection of Cross Motion |
||
April 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #001) Waiver and consents |
||
April 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Attorney Alan Gerson affirmation |
||
April 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Affidavit of Heirship by Paula Lewis |
||
April 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) Bank's erroneous petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.