Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Helena Cygan, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Baginski, Olga, Stern, Joshua Howard, Wierzbicki, Pawel Piotr, against Andrew Gouzoulis, Joseph Tomlinson, represented by O'Sullivan, Sean J., in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 01, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 15, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 01, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 01, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 15, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 25, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 05, 2022SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: October 15, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 01, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 13, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 25, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: October 15, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 14, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 12, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 05, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 17, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 13, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 31, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 13, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: May 25, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 02, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 28, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 28, 2023ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: February 15, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 13, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 13, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 13, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 20, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2023 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
October 13, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response to Third-Party Defendant's Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
October 13, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Plaintiff's Response to Third-Party Defendant's Combined Demands (without Exhibits) |
||
October 13, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Verified Bill of Particulars (without Exhibits) |
||
October 13, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - to Third-Party De Plaintiff's Demand for a Verified Bill of Particulars as to Affirmative Defenses - to Third-Party De ... show more |
||
October 13, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Demand for Insurance Information Pursuant to CPLR Section 3101(f) - to Third-Party Defen Plaintiff's Demand for Insurance Information Pursuant to CPLR Section 3101(f) - to Third-Party Defen ... show more |
||
October 13, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's Notice of Discovery and Inspection and Combined Demands - to Third-Party Defendant |
||
August 31, 2023 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
August 31, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 06, 2023 | ANSWER (AMENDED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.