Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Breanna P. Dhautal, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Baron, Scott J., against Anthony P. Andrews, Verizon, represented by Cash, Joshua, Graham, Omar Y., in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 02, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 03, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
March 03, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 02, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
February 02, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 19, 2022 |
ANSWER Verified Answer with Combined Demands |
||
October 15, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ANTHONY P. ANDREWS |
||
July 01, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.