Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Iveta Bannahyan, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Hamel, William R, Kleban, Alla, Liakas, Dean Nicholas, Liakas, Stephen John, against Rego Gardens Owners, Llc, represented by Suleymanov, Jessica L, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Negligence) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 23, 2021SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: July 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Second Supplemental Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
February 24, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
August 15, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
June 29, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
June 14, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
May 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF CHARGING LIEN | ||
October 28, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 01, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.