Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Geico General Insurance Company As Subrogee Of Guillermo Valencia And Daniel Galvis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Katechis, Chris, against Sheena Lawrence, represented by Liloia, Michael J., Ragone, Heather Cara, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Cc Compliance presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCc Compliance Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 01, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001) | ||
February 08, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 04, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Exhibit A |
||
November 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B |
||
November 04, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
October 05, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
July 13, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
June 15, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
June 15, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.