Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nyctl 2018-A Trust And The Bank Of New York Mellon As Collateral Agent And Custodian, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Dello-Iacono, John Dayton, against American Express Centurion Bank, Astoria Federal Savings & Loan Association, Autovest, Llc, Cacv Of Colorado, Llc, Capital One Bank, (total of 33) See All represented by Gatto, Christopher M, Schwartz, Beth Patricia, Ward, Yvonne Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Queens County. This case was filed in Queens County Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 21, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time117 days |
STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 16, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 16, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 21, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos criminal court of the city of new york |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MOHMMED |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE COMMISSIONER |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CITIBANK |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE jp bank |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FIRST JERSEY |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE john doe#2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.