Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Central Penn Capital Management Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Caruso, Michael Robert, against 82-02 45Th Ave. Corp., Criminal Court Of The City Of New York, James Kwang Lee, New York City Department Of Finance, New York City Environmental Control Board, (total of 7) See All represented by Kim, Daniel D., Schiavetta, Daniel Michael, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Leonard Livote presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeonard Livote Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 13, 2022 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial - Commercial Division |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 13, 2022NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 13, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2023 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
January 11, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Plaintiff's letter in response to Defendant-Borrowers letter dated 1/9/2023 regarding insurance defa Plaintiff's letter in response to Defendant-Borrowers letter dated 1/9/2023 regarding insurance defa ... show more |
||
January 09, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter In Response to Plaintiff's Letter dated Jan 5, 2023 |
||
January 05, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) regarding Defendants on-going failure to insure property Redacted per 22 NYCRR regarding Defendants on-going failure to insure property Redacted |
||
December 07, 2022 |
ORDER - REFERENCE TO ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION. STIPULATION ATTACHED. |
||
December 06, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 21, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 21, 2022 |
STIPULATION - OTHER Mediation Stipulation |
||
November 17, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Letter to Judge Regarding Sur-Reply |
||
November 15, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #003) Letter Seeking Permission |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.