Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brigitte Seda-Vargas, M J. V, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Filippazzo, Stefano A., against The City Of New York, The New York City Department Of Education, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Kevin Kerrigan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin Kerrigan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management226 days |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 24, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 24, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 02, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2021 | Hearing |
TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
February 18, 2021 | Hearing |
Rescheduled TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
February 18, 2021 | Hearing |
TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
December 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
December 17, 2020 | Hearing |
ADMINISTRATIVELY RESCHEDULED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
October 22, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
October 22, 2020 | Hearing |
ADMINISTRATIVELY RESCHEDULED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
July 23, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
July 23, 2020 | Hearing |
ADMINISTRATIVELY RESCHEDULED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
May 28, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled TRIAL SCHEDULING PART-CITY CON (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.