Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jihoon Won, Yong Hee Lee, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Park, Inho A., against Andre Green, represented by Malone, Debra Anne, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with CARMEN VELASQUEZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARMEN VELASQUEZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management213 days |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1369 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 23, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 24, 2019ANSWER
Date: December 11, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
July 26, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled - Other TRIAL SCHEDULING PART FIN(T) (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
July 26, 2018 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL TRIAL SCHEDULING PART FIN(T) Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | |
April 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned TRIAL SCHEDULING PART FIN (Conversion) Judge: Scheduling Judge, Trial |
|
April 11, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TRIAL SCHEDULING PART FIN Judge: TRIAL SCHEDULING JUDGE |
|
March 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Centralized Motion Part 010518 (Conversion) Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Carmen |
|
March 09, 2018 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #002) CENTRALIZED MOTION PART Judge: CARMEN VELASQUEZ |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | |
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.