Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of State Farm Insurance Company, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Desena, Louis J., Wade, Arthur Thompson, against For A Judgment Staying The Arbitration Commenced By Willie Storey, Geico Insurance Company, Rong Guo, represented by Cherny, Aleksandr Simon, Lauzon, Gail S., in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts with Timothy J Dufficy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy J Dufficy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedSeptember 15, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time209 days |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: February 08, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 20, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 27, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 29, 2016 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal |
||
February 29, 2016 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry |
||
February 11, 2016 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
||
February 11, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Order |
||
February 11, 2016 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry |
||
February 08, 2016 | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | ||
October 28, 2015 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) PART 13 MOTIONS E/F, DNY (Conversion) Judge: Raffaele, Hon. Thomas D. |
|
October 28, 2015 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) PT 13 MOTIONS E/F DNY Judge: THOMAS D. RAFFAELE |
|
October 27, 2015 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #001) Affirmation in Reply to Respondent's Further Opposition |
||
October 27, 2015 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.