Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tenpa Gyaltsen, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Bhurtel, Durga P, against Delancey Suffolk Associates,Llc, Synergy Construction Inc, represented by Bernstein, Robert Louis, Garvey, Patrick James, Kolbe, George S, Rudkin, Danielle Marie, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Carmen R Velasquez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarmen R Velasquez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management185 days |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time826 days |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: June 16, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: January 19, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 25, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 16, 2016ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 08, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 22, 2016ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: March 01, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: October 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: October 04, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 22, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 21, 2017NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: October 21, 2016NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 22, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 28, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 25, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: October 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: October 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2015AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #4)
Date: September 06, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: November 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: November 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: November 22, 2016AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: October 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2015AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: April 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 09, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 09, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 22, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 09, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: November 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 25, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 09, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: November 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: December 16, 2015ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 04, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 08, 2016AFFIRMATION
Date: April 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 25, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 25, 2016AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 31, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 16, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 25, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 25, 2016AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #4)
Date: May 31, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 25, 2016AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: April 22, 2016AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: April 25, 2016AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #4)
Date: June 14, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 25, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 15, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 28, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 28, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 21, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 02, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: October 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: October 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: October 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: October 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: November 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: October 21, 2016AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: November 22, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2016AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: November 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: November 22, 2016ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: July 13, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: October 05, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #007)
Date: April 21, 2017AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: April 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #008)
Date: April 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 16, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 25, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 28, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 28, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: November 16, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 16, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 21, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 16, 2015ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: September 24, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 16, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: October 04, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 22, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 15, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry | |
October 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
October 05, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
October 04, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM | |
September 29, 2017 | Hearing |
Inactive NOTE OF ISSUE DUE NO NOI (Conversion) Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Carmen |
|
September 29, 2017 | Hearing |
INACTIVE PRE-NOTE NOTE OF ISSUE DUE NO NOI Judge: CARMEN VELASQUEZ |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
June 29, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Compliance Conference Part Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Carmen |
|
June 29, 2017 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE HELD PRENOTE COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Judge: CARMEN VELASQUEZ |
|
May 24, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #008) Centralized Motion Part 2MOTS 1SFO (Conversion) Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Carmen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.