Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rakesh Sandal, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Pomara, Francesco, against Alix Jacques, Mta Bus Company, represented by Mannarino, Richard Ottavio, in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Robert J Mcdonald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert J Mcdonald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management191 days |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time969 days |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: November 07, 2016RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 30, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2020 | Hearing |
Post Disposition - Settled PART 21 NIV/CON (Conversion) Judge: Golia, Hon. Donna Marie |
|
August 17, 2020 | Hearing |
PD - SETTLED PT 21 CONFERENCE NIV/CON Judge: DONNA GOLIA |
|
July 24, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned PART 01 NIV/CON (Conversion) Judge: Silver, Hon. George J. |
|
July 24, 2020 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED PT 1 GEN CAL NIV/CON Judge: GEORGE J. SILVER |
|
June 26, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled PART 01 ADMIN (Conversion) Judge: Silver, Hon. George J. |
|
June 26, 2020 | Hearing |
PD-ADMINISTRATIVELY RESCHEDULE PT 1 GEN CAL ADMIN Judge: GEORGE J. SILVER |
|
April 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Rescheduled PART 01 Judge: Silver, Hon. George J. |
|
April 03, 2020 | Hearing |
PD-ADMINISTRATIVELY RESCHEDULE PT 1 GEN CAL Judge: GEORGE J. SILVER |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE COURT NOTICE |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.