Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association As Trustee For Merrill Lynch First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-H1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Britt, Kenneth O, Christie, Monica G, Cosentino, Kelly, Dagounis, Marika Denise, Gantz, David, (total of 11) See All against City Of New York Transit Adjudication Bureau, George W. Schieren, John Doe #1 Through #6, And Jane Doe #1 Through #6, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious, It Being The Intention Of Plaintiff To Designate Any And All Occupants, Tenants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Being Foreclosed Herein, Keith M. Schieren, Luz D. Cabrera, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Queens County, NY, . Queens County, NY Superior Courts Queens County Supreme Court with Cheree A Buggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCheree A Buggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationQueens County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseQueens County Supreme Court |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 04, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 06, 2015ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: March 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 24, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Atty Affirmation Re: Auction Sale of 2/24/2023 |
||
February 24, 2023 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
January 25, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING - NOTICE OF SALE |
||
January 25, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
January 25, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 16, 2022 |
ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE JCS Conference Order |
||
November 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 03, 2022 |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE ORDER CONFIRMING REFEREE REPORT, COSTS OF PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.